+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On May 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Governor Action: Signed
On May 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
- Final reading in Senate: Passed
- Senate concurred.
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Conference committee recommended.
- Senate Minority Caucus.
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On March 28, 2016 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Floor Amend to Bill - Barton - passed
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- Objection to the consent calendar.
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 3:37PM.
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- House Agriculture, Water and Lands Committee: do pass.
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Agriculture, Water and Lands Committee.
- First read in House.
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- NR (ref Bill) adopted
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Natural Resources Committee: do pass amended.
On January 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Natural Resources Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Amendments (5)
Natural Resources
Senate Proposed Amendment
Natural Resources
Senate Adopted Amendment
Floor Amend to Bill - Barton - passed
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (12)
May 4, 2016: Senate Final Reading
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 5
May 4, 2016: Senate final read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 2
March 28, 2016: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 45
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 2
March 28, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 45
- Nays: 13
February 24, 2016: Agriculture, Water and Lands: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 3
February 24, 2016: House Agriculture, Water and Lands Committee
- Yeas: 7
February 24, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
February 24, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
February 18, 2016: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 9
February 18, 2016: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 1
January 27, 2016: Senate Natural Resources Committee
- Yeas: 5
January 27, 2016: Natural Resources: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2