+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 167
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Consent calendar: 2:16 pm
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Transportation: Do pass
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- House second read
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Transportation
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 1:15 pm
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transportation: Do pass
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Transportation
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendment
2-15 trans
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
April 10, 2013: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 45
- Nays: 15
February 28, 2013: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
February 28, 2013: Transportation: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 6
February 27, 2013: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 1
February 4, 2013: Transportation: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor