+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 4, 2012 in the Senate:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 181
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
On April 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On March 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 28, 2012 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 22, 2012 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Consent calendar: 2:51 pm
On March 15, 2012 in the House:
- Agriculture and Water: Do pass
On March 2, 2012 in the House:
- House second read
On March 1, 2012 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Agriculture and Water
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 27, 2012 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: NRT (ref Bill)
On February 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 13, 2012 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 6, 2012 in the Senate:
- Natural Resources and Transportation: Do pass amended
On January 30, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 26, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Natural Resources and Transportation
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (5)
Natural Resources and Transportation
Senate Proposed Amendment
Natural Resources and Transportation
Senate Adopted Amendment
2-8 nrt_caucus-floor
Senate Fact Sheet
Natural Resources and Transportation
Senate Adopted Amendment
Natural Resources and Transportation
Senate Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
March 28, 2012: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 48
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 3
March 1, 2012: Agriculture and Water: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
March 1, 2012: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
February 27, 2012: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 4
January 26, 2012: Natural Resources and Transportation: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 6