+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (36)
On June 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 249
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
On June 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On June 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate final read: Passed
On June 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
- Senate concurrence
On June 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On June 10, 2013 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Forese
- Third read: Passed
On June 4, 2013 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
On May 30, 2013 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- Health: Withdrawn
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Commerce: Do pass
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- House second read
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Commerce
- Assigned to committee: Health
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 1:22 pm
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Commerce, Energy and Military: Do pass
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Commerce, Energy and Military
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (2)
Forese Floor Amendment; Reference to Senate engrossed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Forese Floor Amendment; Reference to Senate engrossed bill
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
June 14, 2013: Senate final read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
June 10, 2013: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 57
- Present/NV: 3
February 25, 2013: Commerce: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
February 25, 2013: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
February 21, 2013: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
February 4, 2013: Commerce, Energy and Military: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor