+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- House Military Affairs & Public Safety Committee: do pass amended.
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Military Affairs & Public Safety Committee.
- First read in House.
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- HHS (ref Bill) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Health and Human Services Committee: do pass amended.
On January 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Health and Human Services Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
March 2, 2021: House Military Affairs & Public Safety Committee
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 3
February 23, 2021: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 4
January 25, 2021: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor