+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Governor Action: Signed
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
- Final reading in Senate: PASSED
- Senate concurred.
- Conference committee recommended.
- Senate Minority Caucus.
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- SUB Floor Amend to TRANS - Teller - passed
- TRANS
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Committee of the Whole consent calendar at 4:00PM.
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- House Transportation Committee: do pass amended.
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Transportation Committee.
- First read in House.
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Carter flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
- TPS (ref Bill) adopted
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Transportation and Public Safety Committee: do pass amended.
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Transportation and Public Safety Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (6)
April 4, 2019: Senate Final Reading
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 1
April 3, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 57
- Nays: 3
February 26, 2019: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
February 26, 2019: House Transportation Committee
- Yeas: 7
February 18, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 1
January 31, 2019: Senate Transportation and Public Safety Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor