+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 13, 2012 in the Senate:
- Vote detail 14 16 0 0 failed
- Motion to reconsider: Date ayes nays nv exc vac
On March 12, 2012 in the Senate:
- 0 0 0 0
- Motion
- Senator reagan motion to reconsider whereby the Senate failed to pass sb 1338 on third reading on march 8, 2012. motion carried.
- Final disposition: Failed in Senate on third reading on reconsideration
On March 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Third read: Failed
On March 6, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On March 5, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained
On March 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Consent calendar: 1:25 pmobject
On February 29, 2012 in the Senate:
- Finance: Withdrawn
On February 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Commerce and Energy: Do pass
On January 30, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 26, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Finance
- Assigned to committee: Commerce and Energy
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (2)
Ways and Means - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Ways and Means - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
March 8, 2012: Third read: failed (Senate)
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 20
- Present/NV: 2
January 26, 2012: Commerce and Energy: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 1