+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (31)
On June 20, 2007 in the House:
- Appropriations: Do pass amended/strike-everything
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: APPROP
- Third read: Failed
- Final disposition: Held in House
On June 18, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
On March 14, 2007 in the House:
- Commerce: Do pass
On March 1, 2007 in the House:
- House second read
On February 28, 2007 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Commerce
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 27, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 27, 2007 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment withdrawn: CED (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: JUD (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: RULES (ref JUD)
- Amendment adopted: Verschoor flr amend (ref CED)
On February 21, 2007 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration amended with recommendation for a floor amendment
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 12, 2007 in the Senate:
- Judiciary: Do pass amended
On January 31, 2007 in the Senate:
- Commerce and Economic Development: Do pass amended
On January 29, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Assigned to committee: Commerce and Economic Development
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On January 24, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (15)
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Judiciary
Senate Adopted Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Commerce and Economic Development
Senate Adopted Amendment
Judiciary
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Commerce and Economic Development
Senate Proposed Amendment
Verschoor Floor Amendment, reference to JUD amendment
Senate Adopted Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Judiciary
Senate Adopted Amendment
Judiciary
Senate Proposed Amendment
Commerce and Economic Development
Senate Adopted Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Commerce and Economic Development
Senate Proposed Amendment
Verschoor Floor Amendment, reference to JUD amendment
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
June 20, 2007: Third read: failed (House)
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 25
- Present/NV: 5
June 18, 2007: Appropriations: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 6
- Absent: 4
February 28, 2007: Commerce: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 2
February 28, 2007: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 3
February 27, 2007: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 30
January 29, 2007: Judiciary: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
January 29, 2007: Commerce and Economic Development: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 1