+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On May 3, 2012 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
- Final disposition: Held in House
On April 11, 2012 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
On April 10, 2012 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On April 9, 2012 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 15, 2012 in the House:
- Ways and Means: Do pass
On March 13, 2012 in the House:
- House second read
On March 12, 2012 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Ways and Means
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 28, 2012 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: FIN (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: RULES (ref FIN)
On February 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration amended
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 16, 2012 in the Senate:
- Finance: Do pass amended
On January 30, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 26, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Finance
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (6)
+ − Votes (4)
March 12, 2012: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
March 12, 2012: Ways and Means: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 2
February 28, 2012: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 9
January 26, 2012: Finance: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor