+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 15, 2012 in the House:
- Judiciary: Held
On March 5, 2012 in the House:
- Final disposition: Held in House
- House second read
On March 2, 2012 in the House:
- Rules
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- House first read
On February 28, 2012 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: McComish flr amend (ref Bill) (sub EDJC)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On February 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained
On February 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 13, 2012 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Economic Development and Jobs Creation: Do pass amended
On February 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Economic Development and Jobs Creation
- Commerce and Energy: Withdrawn
On January 30, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 26, 2012 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Commerce and Energy
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (11)
Commerce and Energy
Senate Proposed Amendment
Judiciary
House Proposed Amendment
Economic Development and Jobs Creation
Senate Adopted Amendment
Commerce and Energy
Senate Proposed Amendment
Judiciary
House Proposed Amendment
Judiciary - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Economic Development and Jobs Creation
Senate Proposed Amendment
Economic Development and Jobs Creation
Senate Adopted Amendment
Economic Development and Jobs Creation
Senate Proposed Amendment
Judiciary - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
McComish flr amend (ref Bill) (sub EDJC) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
February 28, 2012: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 11
February 7, 2012: Economic Development and Jobs Creation: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor