+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On April 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor Action: Signed
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Final reading in Senate: Passed
- Senate concurred.
- Conference committee recommended.
- Senate Minority Caucus.
- Transmit to Governor.
On April 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- HEALTH - passed
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- House Health Committee: do pass amended.
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Health Committee.
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Barto flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Health and Human Services Committee: do pass.
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Health and Human Services Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
April 18, 2017: Senate Final Reading
- Yeas: 28
April 17, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 2
February 28, 2017: House Health Committee
- Yeas: 8
February 28, 2017: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
February 22, 2017: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 5
January 31, 2017: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor