+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 45
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Banking and Financial Services: Do pass
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- House second read
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Banking and Financial Services
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: Farnsworth flr amend (ref Bill)
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 1:40 pmobject
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Financial Institutions: Do pass
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Financial Institutions
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendment
Farnsworth flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
March 17, 2015: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 58
- Present/NV: 2
February 25, 2015: Banking and Financial Services: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 2
February 25, 2015: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
February 23, 2015: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
February 2, 2015: Financial Institutions: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1