+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On March 23, 2010 in the Senate:
- Final disposition: Held awaiting committee of whole
- Minority caucus: H
- Majority caucus: H
On March 22, 2010 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 24, 2010 in the Senate:
- Finance: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On February 22, 2010 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Finance
- Education Accountability and Reform: Withdrawn
On February 3, 2010 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Education Accountability and Reform
- Senate second read
On February 2, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (6)
Finance - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Finance - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Finance - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Finance - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Finance - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Finance - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
+ − Vote
February 22, 2010: Finance: Do pass amended/strike-everything (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor