+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Judiciary: Do pass
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- House second read
- Final disposition: Held in House
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Rules
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: GE (ref Bill)
- Third read: Passed
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Government and Environment: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Elections: Do pass
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Government and Environment
- Assigned to committee: Elections
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (7)
Government and Environment
Senate Proposed Amendment
Government and Environment - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Government and Environment - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Government and Environment
Senate Proposed Amendment
Government and Environment - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
2-19 ge_strikermemo
Senate Fact Sheet
Government and Environment - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
March 11, 2013: Judiciary: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
February 28, 2013: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 2
February 4, 2013: Elections: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
February 4, 2013: Government and Environment: Do pass amended/strike-everything (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor