+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 88
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 1:40 pmobject
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Safety, Military and Technology: Do pass
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Public Safety, Military and Technology
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Votes (3)
February 26, 2015: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 25
- Present/NV: 1
February 23, 2015: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 1
February 2, 2015: Public Safety, Military and Technology: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1