+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 22, 2012 in the House:
- Appropriations: Do pass
On March 15, 2012 in the House:
- Judiciary: Do pass
On March 13, 2012 in the House:
- House second read
- Final disposition: Held in House
On March 12, 2012 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Rules
On March 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: APPROP (ref Bill)
- Third read: Passed
On March 8, 2012 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Border Security, Federalism and States Sovereignty: Withdrawn
On February 21, 2012 in the Senate:
- Appropriations: Do pass amended
On January 30, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 26, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Border Security, Federalism and States Sovereignty
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (8)
Appropriations
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Adopted Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Adopted Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
3-8 bsfss-approp_caucus-floor
Senate Fact Sheet
2-20 bsfss_approp
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (4)
March 12, 2012: Appropriations: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 1
March 12, 2012: Judiciary: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 2
March 8, 2012: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 2
January 26, 2012: Appropriations: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 2