+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- House second read
- Final disposition: Held in House
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Agriculture and Water
- Rules
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 1:20 pm
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Government and Environment: Do pass
On February 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Government and Environment
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (3)
Technology and Infrastructure - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Technology and Infrastructure - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
2-13 ge
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (2)
March 11, 2014: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 2
February 4, 2014: Government and Environment: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor