+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration with recommendation for a floor amendment
- Final disposition: Held awaiting committee of whole
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Elections: Do pass amended
On February 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Judiciary: Do pass amended
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Elections
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (9)
Judiciary
Senate Proposed Amendment
Judiciary
Senate Proposed Amendment
Elections
Senate Proposed Amendment
Elections
Senate Proposed Amendment
Elections
Senate Proposed Amendment
Elections
Senate Proposed Amendment
Judiciary
Senate Proposed Amendment
Judiciary
Senate Adopted Amendment
Elections
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
February 4, 2013: Elections: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
February 4, 2013: Judiciary: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 9