+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On May 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- Action: Vetoed
On May 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 25, 2012 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
- Senate concurrence
- Senate final read: Passed
On April 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On April 23, 2012 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On April 19, 2012 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Court
On April 17, 2012 in the House:
- Rules: Removal request from Rules Committee
On March 15, 2012 in the House:
- Judiciary: Do pass
On March 13, 2012 in the House:
- House second read
On March 12, 2012 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 8, 2012 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
- Third read: Passed
On February 9, 2012 in the Senate:
- Border Security, Federalism and States Sovereignty: Do pass
On January 30, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Finance: Withdrawn
- Assigned to committee: Border Security, Federalism and States Sovereignty
On January 26, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Finance
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (4)
Court Floor Amendment; Reference to Senate engrossed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Court Floor Amendment; Reference to Senate engrossed bill
House Adopted Amendment
2-7 bsfss
Senate Fact Sheet
6-22 bsfss_asvetoed
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
April 25, 2012: Senate final read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 2
April 23, 2012: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 15
- Present/NV: 9
March 12, 2012: Judiciary: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 2
March 8, 2012: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 2
January 30, 2012: Border Security, Federalism and States Sovereignty: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2