+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (39)
On April 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 225
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
- Senate final read: Passed
- Senate concurrence
- Concurrence recommended
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Vote detail 31 28 1 0 y passed
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider: Date ayes nays nv exc vac
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Representative livingston moved that the House reconsider sb1332 on wednesday, april 1st, 2015. motion passed by v/v
- Motion
- 0 0 0 0
- Third read: Failed
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Boyer
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Education: Do pass
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- House second read
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Education
- House first read
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Consent calendar: 1:40 pm
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Education: Do pass
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Education
- Senate first read
+ − Amendment
Floor Amend to Bill - Boyer - passed
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
April 2, 2015: Senate final read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 10
March 25, 2015: Third read: failed (House)
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 32
- Present/NV: 1
February 24, 2015: Education: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 1
February 24, 2015: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
February 19, 2015: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 1
February 2, 2015: Education: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor