+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On February 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration amended.
On February 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Health and Human Services Committee: do pass amended.
On January 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Health and Human Services Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Vote
January 25, 2022: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor