+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 121
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
- Senate concurrence
- Senate final read: Passed
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment: WM - passed by s/v 26-18
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- Ways and Means: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- House second read
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Ways and Means
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 1:30 pm
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Safety: Do pass
On February 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Public Safety
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (6)
Ways and Means - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Ways and Means - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Ways and Means - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Ways and Means - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
2-10ps
Senate Fact Sheet
4-16 fin_aspassedhouse
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (6)
April 16, 2014: Senate final read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
April 15, 2014: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 41
- Nays: 19
March 10, 2014: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 4
March 10, 2014: Ways and Means: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 1
February 24, 2014: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
February 4, 2014: Public Safety: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor