+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Rules: Held
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Military Affairs and Public Safety: Do pass
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- House second read
- Final disposition: Held in House
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Military Affairs and Public Safety
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: PSMT (ref Bill)
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Safety, Military and Technology: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Federalism, Mandates and Fiscal Responsibility: Do pass
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Public Safety, Military and Technology
- Assigned to committee: Federalism, Mandates and Fiscal Responsibility
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (2)
Public Safety, Military and Technology - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Public Safety, Military and Technology - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
March 12, 2015: Military Affairs and Public Safety: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 1
March 11, 2015: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 1
February 2, 2015: Federalism, Mandates and Fiscal Responsibility: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
February 2, 2015: Public Safety, Military and Technology: Do pass amended/strike-everything (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor