+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Final disposition: Failed in Senate on third reading
- Third read: Failed
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Consent calendar: 1:40 pmobject
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Health and Human Services: Do pass
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Health and Human Services
- Senate first read
+ − Votes (2)
March 10, 2015: Third read: failed (Senate)
- Yeas: 15
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 2
February 2, 2015: Health and Human Services: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor