+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- House second read
- Final disposition: Held in House
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Public Safety, Military and Regulatory Affairs
- Approp
- Rules
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 1:55 pm
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Commerce, Energy and Military: Do pass
On February 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Commerce, Energy and Military
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendment
2-10 cem
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (2)
March 10, 2014: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 25
- Present/NV: 5
February 4, 2014: Commerce, Energy and Military: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor