+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (36)
On May 8, 2007 in the Senate:
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
- Chapter: 197
- Action: Signed
On May 2, 2007 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
- Senate final read: Passed
- Senate concurrence
On April 30, 2007 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
On April 26, 2007 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
On April 24, 2007 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On April 23, 2007 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On April 19, 2007 in the House:
- Amendment passed: APPROP
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On April 17, 2007 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On April 12, 2007 in the House:
- Appropriations: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On April 2, 2007 in the House:
- Judiciary: Withdrawn
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
On February 26, 2007 in the House:
- House second read
On February 22, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- House first read
On February 19, 2007 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 15, 2007 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: JUD (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: Leff flr amend (ref JUD)
On February 13, 2007 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 12, 2007 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 5, 2007 in the Senate:
- Judiciary: Do pass amended
On January 25, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Senate second read
On January 24, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (16)
Appropriations - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Leff Floor Amendment, reference to JUD Committee Amendment
Senate Adopted Amendment
Judiciary
Senate Adopted Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Judiciary
Senate Proposed Amendment
Leff Floor Amendment, reference to JUD Committee Amendment
Senate Adopted Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Judiciary
Senate Adopted Amendment
2-12caucus&floor
Senate Fact Sheet
2-1 jud
Senate Fact Sheet
6-6 as enacted
Senate Fact Sheet
2-21 as passed senate
Senate Fact Sheet
Judiciary
Senate Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
May 2, 2007: Senate final read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
April 23, 2007: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 55
- Present/NV: 5
April 2, 2007: Appropriations: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 15
- Absent: 2
February 22, 2007: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 3
February 19, 2007: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
January 25, 2007: Judiciary: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor