+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (36)
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
- Chapter: 120
- Action: Signed
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate final read: Passed
- Senate concurrence
- Concurrence recommended
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On April 9, 2014 in the House:
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Escamilla
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- Government: Do pass
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- House second read
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Government
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: Shooter flr amend (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: APPROP (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration with recommendation for a floor amendment
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Appropriations: Do pass amended
- Transportation: Do pass
On February 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Transportation
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (11)
Appropriations
Senate Proposed Amendment
Shooter flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Escamilla Floor Amendment; Reference to Senate engrossed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Adopted Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Proposed Amendment
Shooter flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Adopted Amendment
Escamilla Floor Amendment; Reference to Senate engrossed bill
House Adopted Amendment
3-12 trans-approp
Senate Fact Sheet
4-16 trans-approps_aspassedhouse
Senate Fact Sheet
2-14 approp-trans
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (7)
April 16, 2014: Senate final read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
April 15, 2014: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 57
- Nays: 3
March 13, 2014: Government: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 3
March 13, 2014: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 4
March 12, 2014: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 2
February 4, 2014: Appropriations: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 9
February 4, 2014: Transportation: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (41)
Type:
Primary Sponsor