+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 6, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Government: Withdrawn
On March 16, 2010 in the House:
- House second read
- Final disposition: Held in House
On March 15, 2010 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Government
- Rules
On March 8, 2010 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 8, 2010 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 4, 2010 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: GOV (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: Leff flr amendment (ref GOV)
On March 2, 2010 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained
On February 23, 2010 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 22, 2010 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 18, 2010 in the Senate:
- Government Institutions: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On February 2, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 1, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Government Institutions
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (8)
Leff flr amendment (ref GOV) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Government Institutions - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Government Institutions - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Government Institutions
Senate Proposed Amendment
Leff flr amendment (ref GOV) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Government Institutions - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Government Institutions
Senate Proposed Amendment
Government Institutions - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
March 8, 2010: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 2
February 1, 2010: Government Institutions: Do pass amended/strike-everything (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor