+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On March 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Governor Action: Signed
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On March 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On March 21, 2016 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Objection to the consent calendar.
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 3:37PM.
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- House Government and Higher Education Committee: do pass.
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- House Appropriations Committee: withdrawn.
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Government and Higher Education Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Appropriations Committee.
On February 15, 2016 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- RULES (ref ED) adopted
- ED (ref Bill) adopted
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration amended.
On February 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Education Committee: do pass amended.
On February 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Education Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (10)
March 21, 2016: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 39
- Nays: 18
- Present/NV: 3
March 21, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 39
- Nays: 18
February 24, 2016: Government and Higher Education: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 2
February 24, 2016: House Government and Higher Education Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
February 24, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
February 24, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
February 15, 2016: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 2
February 15, 2016: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 3
February 1, 2016: Senate Education Committee
- Yeas: 7
February 1, 2016: Education: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor