+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Allen flr amend (ref Bill) (sub ED) adopted
- RULES (ref ED) withdrawn
- ED (ref Bill)
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration amended with recommendation for a floor amendment.
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Education Committee: do pass amended.
On January 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Education Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Amendments (8)
Education
Senate Proposed Amendment
Education
Senate Proposed Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Education
Senate Adopted Amendment
Allen flr amend (ref Bill) (sub ED) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
January 27, 2016: Education: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
January 27, 2016: Senate Education Committee
- Yeas: 7