+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- House Banking and Insurance Committee: do pass.
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Banking and Insurance Committee.
- First read in House.
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- FIN (ref Bill) adopted
- Bowie flr amend (ref FIN) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: retained.
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Finance Committee: do pass amended.
On January 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Finance Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
March 6, 2017: House Banking and Insurance Committee
- Yeas: 8
March 2, 2017: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 28
January 26, 2017: Senate Finance Committee
- Yeas: 6
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor