+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On April 12, 2017 in the House:
- HEALTH - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On April 3, 2017 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on Committee of the Whole consent calendar at 5:24PM.
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- House Health Committee: do pass amended/strike-everything.
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Health Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:28PM.
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Health and Human Services Committee: do pass.
On January 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Health and Human Services Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
April 17, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 5
February 28, 2017: House Health Committee
- Yeas: 8
February 28, 2017: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 6
February 23, 2017: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 30
January 26, 2017: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor