+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On March 18, 2008 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 17, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 11:45 amobject
- Final disposition: Held awaiting committee of whole
On February 11, 2008 in the Senate:
- Judiciary: Do pass
On January 31, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On January 30, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
+ − Amendment
2-7 jud
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Vote
January 31, 2008: Judiciary: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor