+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 12, 2007 in the House:
- Final disposition: Held in House
- House second read
On March 8, 2007 in the House:
- Rules
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- House first read
On March 5, 2007 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 5, 2007 in the Senate:
- Y passed
- Rfeir action sections
- Third read: Passed
On March 1, 2007 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: JUD (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: RULES (ref JUD)
- Amendment adopted: Miranda flr amend (ref Bill)
On February 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained
On February 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Proper for consideration amended
On February 12, 2007 in the Senate:
- Judiciary: Do pass amended
On January 25, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Senate second read
On January 24, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (10)
Judiciary
Senate Proposed Amendment
Judiciary
Senate Proposed Amendment
Judiciary
Senate Proposed Amendment
Judiciary
Senate Proposed Amendment
Judiciary
Senate Proposed Amendment
Judiciary
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Miranda Floor Amendment, reference to printed bill
Senate Adopted Amendment
Judiciary
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
March 5, 2007: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 2
January 25, 2007: Judiciary: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor