+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (39)
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 184
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate concurrence
- Senate final read: Passed
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment: APPROP
- Amendment passed: Sub Floor Amend to APPROP - Forese
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Appropriations: Do pass amended
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Commerce: Do pass
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- House second read
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Commerce
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: FIN (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: Yarbrough flr amend (ref FIN)
- Third read: Passed
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Appropriations: Do pass
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Finance: Do pass amended
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Finance
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (13)
Appropriations
House Proposed Amendment
Yarbrough flr amend (ref FIN) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Finance
Senate Adopted Amendment
Appropriations
House Adopted Amendment
Forese SUBSTITUTE Floor amendment to the APPROPRIATIONS Committee amendment; Reference to Senate engrossed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Finance
Senate Proposed Amendment
Finance
Senate Adopted Amendment
Appropriations
House Proposed Amendment
Forese SUBSTITUTE Floor amendment to the APPROPRIATIONS Committee amendment; Reference to Senate engrossed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Appropriations
House Adopted Amendment
Yarbrough flr amend (ref FIN) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Finance
Senate Proposed Amendment
4-22 approp_housechanges
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (8)
April 30, 2013: Senate final read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
April 18, 2013: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 50
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 4
March 7, 2013: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
March 7, 2013: Appropriations: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 10
- Absent: 1
March 7, 2013: Commerce: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2
March 6, 2013: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 2
January 31, 2013: Finance: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
January 31, 2013: Appropriations: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor