+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 1, 2024 in the House:
- Amended by TI - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On March 26, 2024 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On March 22, 2024 in the House:
- House Transportation & Infrastructure Committee: do pass amended.
On March 13, 2024 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 12, 2024 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Transportation & Infrastructure Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On March 5, 2024 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On March 5, 2024 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On March 4, 2024 in the Senate:
- TTMC (ref Bill) withdrawn
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On February 20, 2024 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 19, 2024 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On February 15, 2024 in the Senate:
- Senate Transportation, Technology and Missing Children Committee: do pass amended.
On January 31, 2024 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 30, 2024 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Transportation, Technology and Missing Children Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
March 12, 2024: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 9
March 12, 2024: House Transportation & Infrastructure Committee
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 2
March 5, 2024: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 7
January 30, 2024: Senate Transportation, Technology and Missing Children Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor