+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Governor Action: Signed
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- Objection to the consent calendar.
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 5:17PM.
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- House Judiciary Committee: do pass.
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Judiciary Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:26PM.
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Judiciary Committee: do pass.
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Votes (5)
April 3, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 46
- Nays: 14
March 6, 2019: House Judiciary Committee
- Yeas: 10
March 6, 2019: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
February 14, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 30
January 31, 2019: Senate Judiciary Committee
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor