+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On April 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
- Chapter: 253
- Action: Signed
On April 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On April 3, 2015 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Children and Family Affairs: Do pass
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- House second read
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Children and Family Affairs
- House first read
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: Driggs flr amend (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: Driggs flr amend (ref JUD) (sub RULES)
- Amendment: RULES (ref JUD)
- Amendment adopted: JUD (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration amended
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Judiciary: Do pass amended
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (6)
Judiciary
Senate Proposed Amendment
Judiciary
Senate Proposed Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Driggs flr amend (ref JUD) (sub RULES) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Judiciary
Senate Adopted Amendment
Driggs flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
April 3, 2015: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 56
- Present/NV: 4
March 9, 2015: Children and Family Affairs: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 3
March 9, 2015: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
March 3, 2015: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 30
February 2, 2015: Judiciary: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor