+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On July 9, 2009 in the Senate:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 28
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
On July 1, 2009 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
- Senate concurrence
- Senate final read: Passed
- Transmitted to: Governor
On July 1, 2009 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On June 29, 2009 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: GOV
On June 26, 2009 in the House:
- Government: Do pass amended/strike-everything
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On June 23, 2009 in the House:
- House second read
On June 22, 2009 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Government
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On June 19, 2009 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On June 18, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: Tibshraeny flr amend (ref Bill)
- Third read: Passed
On June 16, 2009 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On June 15, 2009 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On June 11, 2009 in the Senate:
- Government Institutions: Do pass
On June 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Assigned to committee: Government Institutions
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On January 29, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (8)
Tibshraeny Floor Amendment; reference to printed bill
Senate Adopted Amendment
Government - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Government - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Government - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Government - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Tibshraeny Floor Amendment; reference to printed bill
Senate Adopted Amendment
1313gov_as enacted
Senate Fact Sheet
1313gov
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (6)
July 1, 2009: Senate final read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 3
July 1, 2009: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 54
- Present/NV: 6
June 22, 2009: Government: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
June 22, 2009: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
June 18, 2009: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 27
- Present/NV: 3
June 4, 2009: Government Institutions: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 1