+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
- Chapter: 191
- Action: Signed
On April 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On April 17, 2014 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On March 31, 2014 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 24, 2014 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Public Safety, Military and Regulatory Affairs: Do pass
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- House second read
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Public Safety, Military and Regulatory Affairs
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: CEM (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Commerce, Energy and Military: Do pass amended
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Commerce, Energy and Military
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (6)
Commerce, Energy and Military
Senate Proposed Amendment
Commerce, Energy and Military
Senate Adopted Amendment
Commerce, Energy and Military
Senate Proposed Amendment
Commerce, Energy and Military
Senate Adopted Amendment
2-13cem_aspassedcommitee
Senate Fact Sheet
2-10 cem
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
April 17, 2014: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 57
- Present/NV: 3
February 26, 2014: Public Safety, Military and Regulatory Affairs: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 2
February 26, 2014: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 3
February 24, 2014: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
February 3, 2014: Commerce, Energy and Military: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor