+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Governor Action: Signed
On April 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 2:15PM.
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- House Transportation Committee: do pass.
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Transportation Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:36PM.
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Transportation and Technology Committee: do pass.
On January 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Transportation and Technology Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
+ − Votes (5)
April 1, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 42
- Nays: 18
March 1, 2021: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
March 1, 2021: House Transportation Committee
- Yeas: 11
February 16, 2021: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 3
January 25, 2021: Senate Transportation and Technology Committee
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor