+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 29, 2023 in the House:
- House Appropriations Committee: do pass.
On March 27, 2023 in the House:
- House Military Affairs & Public Safety Committee: do pass.
On March 22, 2023 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 21, 2023 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Military Affairs & Public Safety Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Appropriations Committee.
On March 16, 2023 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On March 16, 2023 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On March 14, 2023 in the Senate:
- Gowan flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On February 21, 2023 in the Senate:
- Objection to the consent calendar.
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 20, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 2:21PM.
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 14, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Appropriations Committee: do pass.
On February 8, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Military Affairs, Public Safety and Border Security Committee: do pass.
On January 31, 2023 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 30, 2023 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Military Affairs, Public Safety and Border Security Committee.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
March 21, 2023: House Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 1
March 21, 2023: House Military Affairs & Public Safety Committee
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 4
March 16, 2023: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 12
January 30, 2023: Senate Appropriations1 Committee
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 3
January 30, 2023: Senate Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 3
January 30, 2023: Senate Military Affairs, Public Safety and Border Security Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor