+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 13, 2023 in the House:
- House Land, Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee: do pass.
On March 2, 2023 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 1, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Land, Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee.
- First read in House.
On February 27, 2023 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 27, 2023 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On February 21, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 20, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 2:21PM.
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 14, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Appropriations Committee: do pass.
On February 9, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee: do pass.
On January 31, 2023 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 30, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Votes (5)
March 1, 2023: House Land, Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee
- Yeas: 8
February 27, 2023: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 5
January 30, 2023: Senate Appropriations1 Committee
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 1
January 30, 2023: Senate Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 1
January 30, 2023: Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor