+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 5, 2012 in the House:
- Ways and Means: Do pass
On February 28, 2012 in the House:
- House second read
- Final disposition: Held in House
On February 27, 2012 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Ways and Means
- Rules
On February 20, 2012 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 20, 2012 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 16, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: FIN (ref Bill)
On February 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 13, 2012 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 9, 2012 in the Senate:
- Finance: Do pass amended
On January 30, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 26, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Finance
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (3)
February 27, 2012: Ways and Means: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
February 20, 2012: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 4
January 26, 2012: Finance: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1