+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- House second read
- Final disposition: Held in House
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Commerce
- Rules
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 11:45 am
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Appropriations: Do pass
On February 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Commerce amd Workforce Development: Do pass
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Commerce amd Workforce Development
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Votes (3)
March 9, 2015: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 3
February 2, 2015: Appropriations: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 8
February 2, 2015: Commerce amd Workforce Development: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1