+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: APPROP (ref Bill)
- Amendment failed: Jackson flr amend (ref Bill) (sub APPROP)
- Third read: Failed
- Final disposition: Failed in Senate on third reading
On March 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Appropriations: Do pass amended
On February 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Judiciary: Withdrawn
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
On February 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 31, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (8)
Appropriations
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Adopted Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Proposed Amendment
Judiciary
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Proposed Amendment
Judiciary
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Adopted Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
March 17, 2011: Third read: failed (Senate)
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 18
February 8, 2011: Appropriations: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 5
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor