+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (33)
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Third read: Failed
- Motion to reconsider: Date ayes nays nv exc vac
- 0 0 0 0
- Motion
- Representative livingston moved that the House reconsider sb1306 immediately. motion passed by v/v.
- Final disposition: Held in House
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment: ED - passed as amended
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to ED - Boyer
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Education: Do pass amended
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- House second read
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Education
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: GOV (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: Ward flr amend (ref GOV)
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Government: Do pass amended
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Education: Do pass
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Education
- Assigned to committee: Government
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (8)
Government
Senate Proposed Amendment
Education
Senate Proposed Amendment
Education
House Proposed Amendment
Education
House Proposed Amendment
Ward flr amend (ref GOV) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Government
Senate Adopted Amendment
Floor Amend to ED - Boyer - passed
House Adopted Amendment
Education
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
April 2, 2015: Third read: failed (House)
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 30
- Present/NV: 1
March 12, 2015: Education: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 2
March 12, 2015: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
March 11, 2015: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
February 2, 2015: Education: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
February 2, 2015: Government: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 7