+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 16, 2007 in the Senate:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 56
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
On April 10, 2007 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 9, 2007 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On April 9, 2007 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On April 3, 2007 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Consent calendar: 10:30 am
On March 22, 2007 in the House:
- Human Services: Do pass
On March 15, 2007 in the House:
- House second read
On March 14, 2007 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Human Services
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 8, 2007 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 8, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On February 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 15, 2007 in the Senate:
- Public Safety and Human Services: Do pass
On January 25, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Assigned to committee: Public Safety and Human Services
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On January 24, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
+ − Amendment
2-13 pshs
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
April 9, 2007: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 56
- Present/NV: 4
March 14, 2007: Human Services: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1
March 14, 2007: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1
March 8, 2007: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 3
January 25, 2007: Public Safety and Human Services: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor