+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 22, 2012 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Consent calendar: 2:51 pm
- Final disposition: Held in House
On March 15, 2012 in the House:
- Military Affairs and Public Safety: Do pass
On March 13, 2012 in the House:
- House second read
On March 12, 2012 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Military Affairs and Public Safety
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 6, 2012 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 6, 2012 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 5, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: Antenori flr amend (ref Bill)
On March 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 13, 2012 in the Senate:
- Judiciary: Do pass
On January 30, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 26, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (3)
Antenori flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Antenori flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
2-2 jud
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (4)
March 12, 2012: Military Affairs and Public Safety: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 2
March 12, 2012: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
March 6, 2012: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 1
January 26, 2012: Judiciary: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor