+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Final disposition: Held in House
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Consent calendar: 2:31 pm
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Education: Do pass
- House second read
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Education
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
- Amendment failed: Farley flr amend (ref Bill)
On February 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 1:45 pmobject
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Education: Do pass
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Education
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendment
2-4ed
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (4)
February 27, 2014: Education: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
February 27, 2014: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
February 24, 2014: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 1
February 3, 2014: Education: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor